HI SR26 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR26
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Identify Economic, Environmental, And Regulatory Consequences Of Crop Degradation Caused By Invasive And Endangered Species In Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Identify Economic, Environmental, And Regulatory Consequences Of Crop Degradation Caused By Invasive And Endangered Species In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1419) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR26 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR46 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 29
HR46 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 29