HI SR26 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR26
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Referred to GVO/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Referred to GVO/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Convene A Task Force To Study The Effects On States Of State Legalization Of Cannabis For Adult Recreational Use.
Title
Urging The Governor To Convene A Task Force To Study The Effects On States Of State Legalization Of Cannabis For Adult Recreational Use.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to GVO/JDC, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR26 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR198 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39
HR198 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=26&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR26_.HTM |