HI SR3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Departments Of Health And Human Services To Adopt The Canadian Diagnostic Guideline For Diagnosis Of Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder, As Published In The Canadian Medical Association Journal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Departments Of Health And Human Services To Adopt The Canadian Diagnostic Guideline For Diagnosis Of Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder, As Published In The Canadian Medical Association Journal.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee on HMS deferred the measure.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
2019-01-22SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR187 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT/HSH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback