HI SR32 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Supporting The Governor's Efforts In Investigating And Urging The Bank Of America To Return To Hawaii To Meet With Na Poe Kokua And The Hawaii Fair Lending Coalition Regarding A $150,000,000 Loan Commitment For Native Hawaiians On Hawaiian Homelands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting The Governor's Efforts In Investigating And Urging The Bank Of America To Return To Hawaii To Meet With Na Poe Kokua And The Hawaii Fair Lending Coalition Regarding A $150,000,000 Loan Commitment For Native Hawaiians On Hawaiian Homelands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1803) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HWN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-19 1:17PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:17PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to HWN.
2019-03-07SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback