HI SR35 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Provision Of Education To Incarcerated Parents To Ensure Child Support Issues Are Addressed Without Delay And Upon Release, To Prepare Them For Reintegration With Their Children And Families, Including Grandparents Who Have Raised Their Children.
Title
Incarcerated Parents; Additional Information and Training by DPS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-12 | (S) One Day Notice 03-15-10. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) Reported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2716) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Kidani, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-10 1:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Referred to HMS/PSM. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR80 (Same As) 2010-03-17 - (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 52