HI SR35 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State To Establish An Annual Statewide Clean-up Day On April 22 To Coincide With Earth Day And Celebrate And Honor Hawaii's Environment And Natural Resources.
Title
Statewide Clean-Up Day; Earth Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-16. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from EET/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3255) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to EET/WLA. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=35&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SR35_.HTM |