HI SR35 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Transfer Management Of All Submerged Lands, The Boat Launch Ramp, And Any Related Boat Launch Ramp Facilities Located At The Wahiawa Freshwater State Recreation Area From The Division Of Aquatic Resources To The Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Transfer Management Of All Submerged Lands, The Boat Launch Ramp, And Any Related Boat Launch Ramp Facilities Located At The Wahiawa Freshwater State Recreation Area From The Division Of Aquatic Resources To The Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-11SenateOne Day Notice 04-12-19.
2019-04-11SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2092) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1615), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:50PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-08SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback