HI SR38 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Efforts Of Non-governmental Entities That Help Local Agricultural Producers Meet Federal Food Safety And Food Security Requirements.
Title
Food Safety and Security; Department of Agriculture; Department of Health; Director of Human Services; Non-Governmental Organizations
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-13. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1438) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to AGL. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=38&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR38_.HTM |