HI SR45 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR45
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Public Water Utilities To Consider The Disruption To Traffic And Transportation As A Criterion In Planning Future Maintenance.
Title
Requesting Public Water Utilities To Consider The Disruption To Traffic And Transportation As A Criterion In Planning Future Maintenance.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1718) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR45 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).