HI SR52 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR52
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Recognize And Commemorate August 26, 2020, As Women's Equality Day, Celebrating The Centennial Of, And Honoring Hawaii's Role In, The Women's Suffrage Movement.
Title
Requesting The Governor To Recognize And Commemorate August 26, 2020, As Women's Equality Day, Celebrating The Centennial Of, And Honoring Hawaii's Role In, The Women's Suffrage Movement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 06-30-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from GVO/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3709) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to GVO/LCA. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR52 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.