HI SR59 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR59
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education And University Of Hawaii System To Develop Programming And Educational Supports For Educational Assistants And Long-term Substitute Teachers To Earn Teaching Degrees And Become Full-time Certified Teachers.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education And University Of Hawaii System To Develop Programming And Educational Supports For Educational Assistants And Long-term Substitute Teachers To Earn Teaching Degrees And Become Full-time Certified Teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1436) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1204), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HRE, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR59 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HR54 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HR54 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Department of Education
Educational Assistants
Long-Term Substitute Teachers
Programming and Educational Supports
University of Hawaii
Educational Assistants
Long-Term Substitute Teachers
Programming and Educational Supports
University of Hawaii
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=59&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SR59_.HTM |