HI SR6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR6
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Human Services To Increase The Eligibility Criteria For Receiving Child Care Subsidies.
Title
Urging The Department Of Human Services To Increase The Eligibility Criteria For Receiving Child Care Subsidies.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 903), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 3:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR6 (Carry Over) 2019-03-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=6&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR6_.HTM |