HI SR60 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Clean Up All Litter On The Parcel Of State Lands, Identified As Tax Map Key (3) 7-4-08: 21, Located At The Intersection Of Queen Kaahumanu Highway And Palani Road.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Clean Up All Litter On The Parcel Of State Lands, Identified As Tax Map Key (3) 7-4-08: 21, Located At The Intersection Of Queen Kaahumanu Highway And Palani Road.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1606), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback