HI SR69 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR69
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Hawaii Community Development Authority To Prioritize Investment In Public Facilities Within Transit-oriented Development Zones And The Kalaeloa Community Development District In Any Of Its Statewide Planning Functions Or Involvement Therein.
Title
Encouraging The Hawaii Community Development Authority To Prioritize Investment In Public Facilities Within Transit-oriented Development Zones And The Kalaeloa Community Development District In Any Of Its Statewide Planning Functions Or Involvement Therein.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-19. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2071) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EET/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1579), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EET/TRS, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR69 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.