HI SR69 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR69
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Convene A Task Force With The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, Department Of Agriculture, Invasive Species Council, And Other Interested Parties To Develop A Comprehensive Mitigation Plan With Short And Long Term Solutions To Address The Spread Of And Eradicate Gorse On Hawaii Island.
Title
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Convene A Task Force With The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, Department Of Agriculture, Invasive Species Council, And Other Interested Parties To Develop A Comprehensive Mitigation Plan With Short And Long Term Solutions To Address The Spread Of And Eradicate Gorse On Hawaii Island.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-02-20. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Reported from HWN/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3730) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 12:30PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HWN/AEN. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR69 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.