HI SR87 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Director Of Taxation To Convene A Task Force To Consider Worldwide Combined Reporting Of Corporate Income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Director Of Taxation To Convene A Task Force To Consider Worldwide Combined Reporting Of Corporate Income.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1742) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Fevella.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback