HI SR91 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR91
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Human Resources Development, In Conjunction With The Other Principal Departments, Office Of The Governor, Office Of The Lieutenant Governor, Legislature, And Judiciary To Implement A Pilot Fellowship Program To Train New Employees For Government Jobs.
Title
Urging The Department Of Human Resources Development, In Conjunction With The Other Principal Departments, Office Of The Governor, Office Of The Lieutenant Governor, Legislature, And Judiciary To Implement A Pilot Fellowship Program To Train New Employees For Government Jobs.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-19. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2075) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from LCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1644), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 3:35PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR91 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.