HI SR99 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Engaging, Endorsing, Accepting, And Adopting The Aarhus Convention To Achieve The United Nations Paris Agreement, The 2030 Agenda, And The Universal Declaration Of Human Rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Engaging, Endorsing, Accepting, And Adopting The Aarhus Convention To Achieve The United Nations Paris Agreement, The 2030 Agenda, And The Universal Declaration Of Human Rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-02SenateOne Day Notice 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReported from AEN/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1726) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to AEN/HMS.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR149 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback