IA HF136 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to passenger automobiles designed to carry ten or fewer pupils when used as school buses. (See HF 499.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to passenger automobiles designed to carry ten or fewer pupils when used as school buses. (See HF 499.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 582.
2019-02-21HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 345.
2019-02-04HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2019 9:30AM House Lounge.
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee: Brink, Gassman and Kurth. H.J. 179.
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced, referred to Education. H.J. 157.

Same As/Similar To

HF499 (Similar To) 2019-05-17 - Signed by Governor.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback