IA HF145 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 647.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to reports relating to misconduct of certain school employees required to be submitted to the board of educational examiners. (See HF 637.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to reports relating to misconduct of certain school employees required to be submitted to the board of educational examiners. (See HF 637.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 647.
2019-03-05HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 404.
2019-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-01-31HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee: Brink, Ehlert and Hanusa. H.J. 179.
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced, referred to Education. H.J. 159.

Same As/Similar To

HF637 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Signed by Governor.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback