IA HF164 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 647.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 647.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to licenses for apprentice hunters. (See HF 599.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to licenses for apprentice hunters. (See HF 599.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Wills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 647. |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 383. |
2019-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Breckenridge and Jeneary. H.J. 185. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 183. |
Same As/Similar To
HF599 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF164 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF164.html |