IA HF171 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1011.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the exemption from the hotel and motel taxes for the renting of lodging after a certain number of consecutive days. (See HF 760.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the exemption from the hotel and motel taxes for the renting of lodging after a certain number of consecutive days. (See HF 760.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1011. |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 713. |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Maxwell and Wolfe. H.J. 195. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 184. |
Same As/Similar To
SF131 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 640. S.J. 1140.
HF760 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
SF640 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1152.
HF760 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
SF640 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1152.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF171 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF171.html |