IA HF179 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 598.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to firearms requirements for hunting deer. (See HF 716.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to firearms requirements for hunting deer. (See HF 716.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 598.
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 469.
2019-03-05HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 4:00PM House Lounge.
2019-03-05HouseSubcommittee: Windschitl, Fisher and Kurtz. H.J. 400.
2019-02-28HouseCommittee amendment H-1004 filed. H.J. 384.
2019-02-28HousePursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 383.
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 383.
2019-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2019-02-18HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee: Baxter, Ourth and Thorup. H.J. 289.
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 189.

Same As/Similar To

HF716 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Celsi, and Shipley. S.J. 728.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback