IA HF197 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the assignment of pupils who are siblings to classrooms by school districts. (See HF 598.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the assignment of pupils who are siblings to classrooms by school districts. (See HF 598.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 582.
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 382.
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
2019-02-05HouseSubcommittee: Wheeler, James and Mommsen. H.J. 211.
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced, referred to Education. H.J. 198.

Same As/Similar To

HF598 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback