IA HF209 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the legal sufficiency review of and notification procedures for complaints filed with the Iowa ethics and campaign disclosure board. (Formerly HSB 20)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the legal sufficiency review of and notification procedures for complaints filed with the Iowa ethics and campaign disclosure board. (Formerly HSB 20)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-05 | House | Referred to State Government. H.J. 760. |
2013-02-19 | House | Amendment H-1046 filed. H.J. 338. |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 286. |