IA HF209 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the suspension of Medicaid coverage for an inmate of a public institution. (See HF 423.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the suspension of Medicaid coverage for an inmate of a public institution. (See HF 423.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 582.
2019-02-13HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 291.
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-02-04HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 12:00PM House Lounge.
2019-02-04HouseSubcommittee: Fry, Bergan and Heddens. H.J. 205.
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 200.

Same As/Similar To

SF252 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Reported out of committee as SF 415. S.J. 436.
HF423 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
SF415 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 991.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback