IA HF212 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to school district dress code policies and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 77)
Title
A bill for an act relating to school district dress code policies and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 77)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-10 | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Dvorsky, and Johnson. S.J. 648. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Education. S.J. 648. | |
2011-03-09 | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 600. | |
2011-03-09 | Message from House. S.J. 600. | |
2011-03-08 | Immediate message. H.J. 574. | |
2011-03-08 | Passed House, ayes 91, nays 9. H.J. 570. | |
2011-03-08 | Amendments H-1078 and H-1185 lost. H.J. 570. | |
2011-03-08 | Ruled not germane H-1227. H.J. 569. | |
2011-03-08 | Point of order raised H-1227 not germane. H.J. 569. | |
2011-03-07 | Amendment H-1227 filed. H.J. 558. | |
2011-03-07 | Amendment H-1185 filed. H.J. 557. | |
2011-02-14 | Amendment H-1078 filed. H.J. 322. | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 285. |