IA HF212 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to conducting condemnation proceedings. (Formerly HSB 8) Effective 7-1-13.
Title
A bill for an act relating to conducting condemnation proceedings. (Formerly HSB 8) Effective 7-1-13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 943. |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 922. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 922. |
2013-04-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 832. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 821. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 821. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 721. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Horn, and Whitver. S.J. 361. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 345. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 345. |
2013-02-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 375. |
2013-02-28 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 390. |
2013-02-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 380. |
2013-02-27 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 368. |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 287. |