IA HF223 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Attached to companion SF 416. S.J. 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to reimbursement of witness mileage expenses. (Formerly HSB 6.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to reimbursement of witness mileage expenses. (Formerly HSB 6.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-19SenateAttached to companion SF 416. S.J. 441.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 838.
2019-02-25SenateSubcommittee: Schultz, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 390.
2019-02-21SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 369.
2019-02-21SenateMessage from House. S.J. 369.
2019-02-20HouseImmediate message. H.J. 329.
2019-02-20HousePassed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 323.
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 202.

Same As/Similar To

HSB6 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 186.
SSB1067 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF416 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 858.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback