IA HF224 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of lascivious conduct with a minor, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 23.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of lascivious conduct with a minor, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 23.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseSigned by Governor.
2019-04-29HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 996.
2019-04-24SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1085.
2019-04-24SenatePassed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 1082.
2019-04-24SenateAmendment S-3219 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 1081.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 838.
2019-03-20SenateSubcommittee: Chapman, Petersen, and Sinclair. S.J. 694.
2019-03-19SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 668.
2019-03-19SenateMessage from House. S.J. 668.
2019-03-19HouseImmediate message. H.J. 582.
2019-03-19HousePassed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 570.
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 202.

Same As/Similar To

HSB23 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 186.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback