IA HF225 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to demolition reserves on fire and casualty claims on real property located within a city and requesting an interim study on such reserves.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to demolition reserves on fire and casualty claims on real property located within a city and requesting an interim study on such reserves.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27HouseRereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.
2019-04-04HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 755.
2019-02-19HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 315.
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2019 3:30PM House Lounge.
2019-02-05HouseSubcommittee: Fisher, Grassley and Jacoby. H.J. 211.
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 207.

Same As/Similar To

SF216 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Reported out of committee as SF 557. S.J. 522.
SF557 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback