IA HF227 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating exemptions from the computation of net income for the individual income tax of amounts paid to a child or dependent care provider, and including applicability provisions. (See HF 771.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating exemptions from the computation of net income for the individual income tax of amounts paid to a child or dependent care provider, and including applicability provisions. (See HF 771.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 1042.
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 767.
2019-04-02HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2019-02-19HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee: Bossman, Bloomingdale and Kurth. H.J. 228.
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 207.

Same As/Similar To

HF771 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Jochum, and R. Smith. S.J. 1165.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback