IA HF2339 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to judicial motions and causes of action arising from a person's participation in matters of public significance. (Formerly HSB 537.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to judicial motions and causes of action arising from a person's participation in matters of public significance. (Formerly HSB 537.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Hogg, and Shipley. S.J. 657. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Hogg, and Whiting. S.J. 451. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 424. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 424. |
2020-02-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 367. |
2020-03-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 443. |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 360. |
2020-02-25 | House | Amendment H-8023 adopted. H.J. 360. |
2020-02-20 | House | Amendment H-8023 filed. H.J. 324. |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 246. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB537 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235.