IA HF2418 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a length of service award program for volunteer fire fighters, concerning income tax deductions for volunteer fire fighters, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 165.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a length of service award program for volunteer fire fighters, concerning income tax deductions for volunteer fire fighters, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 165.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Kaufmann and Kurth. H.J. 430. |
2018-02-22 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 309. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB165 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2018 1:30PM House Lounge
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2418 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2418.html |