IA HF2422 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the management of weeds, including noxious weeds, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 640.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the management of weeds, including noxious weeds, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 640.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 700. |
2018-03-27 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 689. |
2018-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 616. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 709. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0. S.J. 709. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 594. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kapucian, Brown, and Hart. S.J. 513. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 449. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 449. |
2018-02-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 392. |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed House, ayes 96 nays 2. H.J. 390. |
2018-02-26 | House | Point of order raised on H-8095, ruled not germane. H.J. 389. |
2018-02-26 | House | Point of order raised on H-8094, ruled not germane. H.J. 389. |
2018-02-23 | House | Amendments H-8094 and H-8095 filed. H.J. 375. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 310. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB640 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.