IA HF2423 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consumer protection modifying provisions applicable to consumer security freezes and personal information security breach protection. (Formerly HSB 622.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to consumer protection modifying provisions applicable to consumer security freezes and personal information security breach protection. (Formerly HSB 622.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 441. |
2018-03-01 | House | Amendment H-8141 out of order. H.J. 438. |
2018-03-01 | House | SF 2177 substituted. H.J. 438. |
2018-03-01 | House | Amendment H-8147 adopted. H.J. 438. |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment H-8147 filed. H.J. 431. |
2018-02-27 | House | Amendment H-8141 filed. H.J. 427. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 312. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB622 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2423 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2423.html |