IA HF2435 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to background checks for employees and students of certain facilities, providers, programs, and agencies. (Formerly HSB 570.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to background checks for employees and students of certain facilities, providers, programs, and agencies. (Formerly HSB 570.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 565. |
2020-03-10 | House | SF 2299 substituted. H.J. 540. |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 291. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB570 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277.
SSB3179 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2299.
SF2299 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 659.
SSB3179 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2299.
SF2299 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 659.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2435 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2435.html |