IA HF2464 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 897.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 897.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the rebate of state sales and use tax to the owner or operator of a raceway facility, and providing penalties. Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the rebate of state sales and use tax to the owner or operator of a raceway facility, and providing penalties. Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 897. |
2014-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 895. |
2014-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895. |
2014-04-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 786. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 837. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 39, nays 10. S.J. 834. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 825. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dotzler, Black and Feenstra. S.J. 819. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 790. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 790. |
2014-04-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 758. |
2014-04-16 | House | Passed House, ayes 78, nays 15. H.J. 754. |
2014-04-09 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-04-08 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 683. |