IA HF2492 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 694.) Item vetoed 6-1-18. Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 694.) Item vetoed 6-1-18. Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | House | Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 1000. |
2018-05-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 996. |
2018-05-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 967. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1056. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 1078. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 20. S.J. 1056. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5305. S.J. 1055. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5305. S.J. 1045. |
2018-05-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 949. |
2018-05-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 971. |
2018-05-03 | House | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 36. H.J. 940. |
2018-05-03 | House | House concurred to Senate amendment H-8466 as amended. H.J. 940. |
2018-05-03 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 939. |
2018-05-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 971. |
2018-05-03 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-03 | House | Amendment H-8475 to Senate amendment H-8466 adopted. H.J. 939. |
2018-05-03 | House | Amendment H-8475 to Senate amendment H-8466 filed. H.J. 938. |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate amendment H-8466 filed. H.J. 938. |
2018-05-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 931. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1025. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 20. S.J. 1025. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5290 adopted. S.J. 1025. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote failed. S.J. 1024. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Motion filed to reconsider vote on S-5295. S.J. 1024. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5295 to S-5290 filed, lost. S.J. 1023. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5290 filed. S.J. 1023. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2412. S.J. 1022. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 2412. S.J. 999. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 999. |
2018-04-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 891. |
2018-04-30 | House | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 40. H.J. 891. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8440 lost. H.J. 890. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8440 filed. H.J. 889. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8413 out of order. H.J. 889. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8443B adopted. H.J. 889. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8443A adopted. H.J. 888. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8444 to amendment H-8443 filed, lost. H.J. 888. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8443 filed. H.J. 888. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8442 to amendment H-8437 out of order. H.J. 888. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8442 to amendment H-8437 filed. H.J. 888. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8437 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 888. |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment H-8413 filed. H.J. 882. |
2018-04-18 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 806. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB694 (Related) 2018-04-17 - NOBA: House Sub
SSB3213 (Related) 2018-04-26 - NOBA: Senate Sub
SF2412 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1025.
SSB3213 (Related) 2018-04-26 - NOBA: Senate Sub
SF2412 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1025.