IA HF2495 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the judicial branch. (Formerly HSB 693.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the judicial branch. (Formerly HSB 693.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 998. |
2018-05-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 996. |
2018-05-01 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 906. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1013. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 21. S.J. 1009. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2411. S.J. 1009. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 2411. S.J. 1000. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1000. |
2018-04-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 891. |
2018-04-30 | House | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 41. H.J. 887. |
2018-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8438 filed, adopted. H.J. 886. |
2018-04-18 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 806. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB693 (Related) 2018-04-17 - NOBA: House Sub
SSB3215 (Related) 2018-04-26 - NOBA: Senate Sub
SF2411 (Similar To) 2018-05-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1010.
SSB3215 (Related) 2018-04-26 - NOBA: Senate Sub
SF2411 (Similar To) 2018-05-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1010.