IA HF25 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the statewide preschool program for four-year-old children by modifying provisions for calculating preschool budget enrollment, providing for adjustments to preschool foundation aid amounts, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the statewide preschool program for four-year-old children by modifying provisions for calculating preschool budget enrollment, providing for adjustments to preschool foundation aid amounts, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-05-05 | House | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-05 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-05-03 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-05 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Koester, Mascher and Wheeler. H.J. 115. |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 90. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF25 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF25.html |