IA HF2502 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, and providing for effective date, contingent effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 690.) Item vetoed 6-1-18. Various effective dates, see bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, and providing for effective date, contingent effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 690.) Item vetoed 6-1-18. Various effective dates, see bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | House | Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 1001. |
2018-05-05 | House | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 996. |
2018-05-05 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-05-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 987. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1076. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 30, nays 17. S.J. 1075. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5322, ruled out of order. S.J. 1075. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Amendment S-5322 filed. S.J. 1075. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5321, ruled out of order. S.J. 1074. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Amendment S-5321 filed. S.J. 1074. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5319, ruled out of order. S.J. 1074. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Amendment S-5319 filed. S.J. 1074. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2419. S.J. 1074. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 2419. S.J. 1066. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1066. |
2018-05-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 981. |
2018-05-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2018-05-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 993. |
2018-05-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 54, nays 33. H.J. 980. |
2018-05-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2018-05-05 | House | Amendment H-8504 adopted. H.J. 979. |
2018-05-05 | House | Amendment H-8504 filed. H.J. 978. |
2018-05-05 | House | Amendment H-8502 adopted, as amended. H.J. 978. |
2018-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 978. |
2018-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-8502 as amended. H.J. 978. |
2018-05-05 | House | Point of order raised on H-8502 as amended, ruled not germane. H.J. 978. |
2018-05-05 | House | Amendment H-8503 to amendment H-8502 filed, adopted. H.J. 978. |
2018-05-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2018-05-05 | House | Amendment H-8481 lost. H.J. 978. |
2018-05-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2018-05-05 | House | Amendment H-8505 to amendment H-8481 lost. H.J. 977. |
2018-05-05 | House | Amendment H-8505 to amendment H-8481 filed. H.J. 976. |
2018-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 975. |
2018-05-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of HF 2502. H.J. 975. |
2018-05-04 | House | Amendment H-8502 filed. H.J. 974. |
2018-05-03 | House | Amendment H-8481 filed. H.J. 951. |
2018-05-03 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 932. |
2018-04-05 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
Same As/Similar To
HSB690 (Related) 2018-05-03 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 950.
SSB3221 (Related) 2018-05-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2419 (Similar To) 2018-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1075.
SSB3221 (Related) 2018-05-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2419 (Similar To) 2018-05-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1075.