IA HF2502 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 791.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to firearms and weapons, including the storage, carrying, possession, or transportation of weapons and the establishment, use, and maintenance of shooting ranges. (Formerly HSB 615.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to firearms and weapons, including the storage, carrying, possession, or transportation of weapons and the establishment, use, and maintenance of shooting ranges. (Formerly HSB 615.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 791. |
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 791. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 633. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 652. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 17. S.J. 651. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5096, ruled out of order. S.J. 651. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5096 filed. S.J. 651. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 650. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 544. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2020 12:00PM RM 315. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Whiting. S.J. 483. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 467. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 467. |
2020-02-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 405. |
2020-03-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 443. |
2020-03-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 416. |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed House, yeas 52, nays 44. H.J. 401. |
2020-02-27 | House | Amendment H-8038 adopted. H.J. 400. |
2020-02-26 | House | Amendment H-8038 filed. H.J. 395. |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 332. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB615 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 328.
SSB3138 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 12:00PM RM G17.
SSB3138 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 12:00PM RM G17.