IA HF2572 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-13 - Amendments H-8307, H-8310 and H-8311 filed. H.J. 766.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-13 - Amendments H-8307, H-8310 and H-8311 filed. H.J. 766.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a construction manager-at-risk commercial construction alternative delivery method and prohibiting certain other alternative delivery methods in the public sector. (Formerly HSB 674.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to a construction manager-at-risk commercial construction alternative delivery method and prohibiting certain other alternative delivery methods in the public sector. (Formerly HSB 674.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | House | Amendments H-8307, H-8310 and H-8311 filed. H.J. 766. |
2020-06-03 | House | Amendment H-8168 filed. H.J. 632. |
2020-03-13 | House | Amendment H-8162 filed. H.J. 598. |
2020-03-04 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 382. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB674 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 323.
SSB3153 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2364.
SF2364 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Fiscal note.
SSB3153 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2364.
SF2364 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2572 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2572.html |