IA HF2590 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 405.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing certain emergency medical care providers to obtain a professional permit to carry weapons. (Formerly HF 2036.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing certain emergency medical care providers to obtain a professional permit to carry weapons. (Formerly HF 2036.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 405. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2006 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2096. S.J. 165.
HF2036 (Similar To) 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 328.
SF2096 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Passed on file. H.J. 565.
HF2036 (Similar To) 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 328.
SF2096 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Passed on file. H.J. 565.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2590 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2590.html |