IA HF260 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 858.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to permissible interest rates and charges for certain loans. (Formerly HSB 31.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to permissible interest rates and charges for certain loans. (Formerly HSB 31.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 858.
2019-04-15HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 858.
2019-04-08HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 764.
2019-04-08SenateImmediate message. S.J. 880.
2019-04-08SenatePassed Senate, yeas 40, nays 10. S.J. 880.
2019-04-08SenateSubstituted for SF 320. S.J. 879.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857.
2019-03-14SenateRead first time and attached to companion SF 320. S.J. 622.
2019-03-14SenateMessage from House. S.J. 622.
2019-03-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 549.
2019-03-13HousePassed House, yeas 53, nays 46. H.J. 541.
2019-03-13HouseAmendment H-1011 withdrawn. H.J. 541.
2019-03-11HouseAmendment H-1011 filed. H.J. 498.
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 219.

Same As/Similar To

HSB31 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 213.
SSB1096 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF320 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 880.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback