IA HF2641 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-17 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to state taxation and related laws of the state, including the administration by the department of revenue of certain tax credits and refunds, income taxes, moneys and credits taxes, sales and use taxes, partnership and pass-through entity audits, and by modifying provisions relating to the reinstatement of business entities, the assessment and valuation of property, the Iowa reinvestment Act, short-term rentals, special registration plates, and animals and food, and providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 696.) Effective date: 06/29/2020, 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 03/23/2020, 01/01/2019, 07/01/2005, 01/01/2022, 05/30/2014, 06/10/2020, 03/27/2020, 01/01/2020, 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to state taxation and related laws of the state, including the administration by the department of revenue of certain tax credits and refunds, income taxes, moneys and credits taxes, sales and use taxes, partnership and pass-through entity audits, and by modifying provisions relating to the reinstatement of business entities, the assessment and valuation of property, the Iowa reinvestment Act, short-term rentals, special registration plates, and animals and food, and providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 696.) Effective date: 06/29/2020, 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 03/23/2020, 01/01/2019, 07/01/2005, 01/01/2022, 05/30/2014, 06/10/2020, 03/27/2020, 01/01/2020, 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-17SenateFiscal note.
2020-06-29SenateSigned by Governor. H.J. 792.
2020-06-29SenateSigned by Governor. H.J. 792.
2020-06-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788.
2020-06-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14SenateMessage from House. S.J. 851.
2020-06-14HouseImmediate message. H.J. 781.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-14HousePassed House, yeas 75, nays 17. H.J. 779.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-8319. H.J. 778.
2020-06-14HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 777.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 787.
2020-06-14HouseAmendment H-8324 to Senate amendment H-8319 lost. H.J. 777.
2020-06-14HouseAmendment H-8324 to Senate amendment H-8319 filed. H.J. 776.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 788.
2020-06-14HouseAmendment H-8323 to Senate amendment H-8319 lost. H.J. 776.
2020-06-14HouseAmendment H-8323 to Senate amendment H-8319 filed. H.J. 775.
2020-06-14HouseSenate amendment H-8319 filed. H.J. 775.
2020-06-14HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 768.
2020-06-13SenateImmediate message. S.J. 837.
2020-06-13SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 861.
2020-06-13SenatePassed Senate, yeas 45, nays 2. S.J. 836.
2020-06-13SenateAmendment S-5157 adopted. S.J. 836.
2020-06-13SenateAmendment S-5161 to S-5157 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 836.
2020-06-13SenatePoint of order raised on S-5160, ruled not germane. S.J. 836.
2020-06-13SenateAmendment S-5160 to S-5157 filed. S.J. 836.
2020-06-13SenateAmendment S-5157 filed. S.J. 836.
2020-06-13SenateFiscal note.
2020-06-13SenateSubstituted for SF 2419. S.J. 835.
2020-06-12SenateFiscal note.
2020-06-12SenateAttached to similar SF 2419. S.J. 795.
2020-06-12SenateMessage from House. S.J. 795.
2020-06-11HouseImmediate message. H.J. 710.
2020-06-11HousePassed House, yeas 91, nays 6. H.J. 710.
2020-06-11HouseAmendment H-8257 adopted, as amended. H.J. 709.
2020-06-11HouseAmendment H-8279 to H-8257 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 709.
2020-06-11HouseAmendment H-8273 to H-8257 filed, adopted. H.J. 709.
2020-06-11HouseAmendment H-8268 to H-8257 filed, adopted. H.J. 708.
2020-06-11HouseAmendment H-8261 adopted. H.J. 708.
2020-06-11HouseFiscal note.
2020-06-10HouseAmendment H-8261 filed. H.J. 691.
2020-06-10HouseAmendment H-8257 filed. H.J. 690.
2020-06-09HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 669.

Same As/Similar To

HSB696 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3199 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee: Sweeney, Brown, and Dotzler.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback