IA HF311 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to applications involving state licenses issued or renewed by the department of agriculture and land stewardship to commercial establishments involved in the care of certain nonagricultural animals. (Formerly HF 8.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to applications involving state licenses issued or renewed by the department of agriculture and land stewardship to commercial establishments involved in the care of certain nonagricultural animals. (Formerly HF 8.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment S-3147 filed. S.J. 909. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 824. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Kinney, and Shipley. S.J. 814. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 793. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 793. |
2019-03-28 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 688. |
2019-04-26 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1055. |
2019-03-28 | House | Passed House, yeas 55, nays 42. H.J. 678. |
2019-03-28 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 678. |
2019-03-28 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1085. H.J. 677. |
2019-03-28 | House | Point of order raised on H-1085, ruled not germane. H.J. 677. |
2019-03-28 | House | Amendment H-1083 adopted. H.J. 676. |
2019-03-27 | House | Amendments H-1083 and H-1085 filed. H.J. 667. |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 234. |
Same As/Similar To
HF8 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 688.