IA HF328 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1080.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the definition of vulnerable elder. (Formerly HSB 30.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the definition of vulnerable elder. (Formerly HSB 30.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 1080.
2019-04-29HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079.
2019-04-25HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1015.
2019-04-25SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1119.
2019-04-25SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1117.
2019-04-25SenateSubstituted for SF 152. S.J. 1117.
2019-04-19SenateRead first time and attached to similar SF 152. S.J. 1026.
2019-04-19SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1026.
2019-04-18HouseImmediate message. H.J. 922.
2019-04-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1013.
2019-04-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1012.
2019-04-18HousePassed House, yeas 95 nays none. H.J. 908.
2019-04-04HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 756.
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 239.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1014 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB30 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 232.
SF152 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1118.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback