IA HF398 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 896.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 896.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the duties and responsibilities of insurance producers under insurance policies or contracts. Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the duties and responsibilities of insurance producers under insurance policies or contracts. Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 896. |
2014-05-09 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 896. |
2014-05-09 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 896. |
2014-04-30 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 868. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 900. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 21. S.J. 899. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 899. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 898. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 898. |
2014-04-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 868. |
2014-04-30 | House | Passed House, ayes 55, nays 42. H.J. 867. |
2014-04-30 | House | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 867. |
2014-04-30 | House | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 866. |
2014-04-30 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 863. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 897. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, Hogg, Gronstal, Courtney, Feenstra, and Anderson. S.J. 897. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 897. |
2014-04-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 862. |
2014-04-30 | House | House conference committee appointed Baltimore, Cownie, Hess, Wolfe, and T. Olson. H.J. 861. |
2014-04-30 | House | House insisted. H.J. 861. |
2014-04-30 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 861. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 894. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-5194. S.J. 894. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5194. S.J. 892. |
2014-04-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 860. |
2014-04-30 | House | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 44. H.J. 860. |
2014-04-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8369, as amended. H.J. 859. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8380 to Senate amendment H-8369 adopted. H.J. 859. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8380 to Senate amendment H-8369 filed. H.J. 858. |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate amendment H-8369. H.J. 858. |
2014-04-30 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 854. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 891. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 32, nays 16. S.J. 891. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Amendment S-5193 filed, adopted. S.J. 891. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Amendment S-3125 withdrawn. S.J. 890. |
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 827. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3125 filed. S.J. 739. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 739. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Horn, and Schneider. S.J. 547. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 482. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 482. |
2013-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 486. |
2013-03-11 | House | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 44. H.J. 483. |
2013-03-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 401. |